X2Y ATTENUATORS, LLC v. INTEL CORPORATION et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: X2Y ATTENUATORS, LLC
Defendant: INTEL CORPORATION, APPLE INC. and HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2011cv00117
Filed: May 31, 2011
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Erie Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Sean J. McLaughlin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2011 Judge Nora Barry Fischer is presiding on this case. (slv) Modified on 10/26/2011
October 26, 2011 Sean J. McLaughlin no longer presiding on this case. (slv)
October 20, 2011 8 Order Declining Assignment of Patent Case, in accordance with Section 1(a)(1)(C) of Public Law 111-349, Pilot Program in Certain District Courts. Signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 10/20/11. (nk)
August 1, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 8/1/11. (nk)
July 29, 2011 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by X2Y ATTENUATORS, LLC. HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY served on 7/14/2011, answer due 8/4/2011. (Chapman, Michael)
July 29, 2011 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by X2Y ATTENUATORS, LLC. APPLE INC. served on 7/14/2011, answer due 8/4/2011. (Chapman, Michael)
July 29, 2011 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by X2Y ATTENUATORS, LLC. INTEL CORPORATION served on 7/14/2011, answer due 8/4/2011. (Chapman, Michael)
July 29, 2011 3 MOTION to Stay by APPLE INC., HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, INTEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Finkel, Robert)
June 14, 2011 2 PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (tt)
May 31, 2011 Summons Issued as to *APPLE INC., HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, INTEL CORPORATION* (dm)
May 31, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against APPLE INC., HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, INTEL CORPORATION (Filing fee $350, receipt number 0315-1981005), filed by X2Y ATTENUATORS, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit a, # 3 Exhibit b, # 4 Exhibit c, # 5 Exhibit d, # 6 Exhibit e) (dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: X2Y ATTENUATORS, LLC v. INTEL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X2Y ATTENUATORS, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTEL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.