UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LESONIK et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: DAVID L. LESONIK, SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, GLIDDEN COMPANY, NORTHWEST SAVINGS BANK, HAMOT MEDICAL CENTER, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA and AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00065
Filed: March 1, 2012
 
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Erie Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Sean J. McLaughlin
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2012 25 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Jury Demand as to Count II is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 7/26/2012. (rlh)
October 2, 2012 39 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 26 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 35 Defendant's Motion to Stay; granting 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel responses to discovery. AND NOW, this 2nd day of October, 2012, and fo r the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 26] is DENIED. Defendant's Motion for Protective Order [Dkt. No. 35] is also DENIED. The United States' Motion to Compel [Dkt. No. 28] is GRANTED. Defendant is hereby ORDERED to (1) provide Initial Disclosures and (2) provide full and complete responses to the United States' First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents on or before November 1, 2012. Signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 10/2/2012. (jdg)
November 6, 2013 56 Featured Case ORDER OF COURT RE: 52 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER GRANTING 55 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL. 52 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Document Numbers 50 and 51 is GRA NTED; 54 Defendant's Notice of Default is STRIKEN; Defendant shall file his response to Plaintiff's interrogatories on or before November 12, 2013; Plaintiff shall review Defendant's responses to interrogatories and on or before Nove mber 19, 2013, file a Notice with this Court that indicates whether: (1) the pending Motion for Sanctions (Doc. No. 47) can with denied as moot based on Defendant's responses or (2) file an updated brief in support of the Motion for Sanctions. Mailed to pro se Defendant this same day. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 11/6/2013. (lcb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LESONIK et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Klimas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID L. LESONIK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLIDDEN COMPANY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHWEST SAVINGS BANK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMOT MEDICAL CENTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]