TAYLOR v. WINNECOUR

Appellee: RONDA WINNECOUR
Appellant: CAROLE L. TAYLOR
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01900
Filed: December 28, 2012
 
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/12/13. (dcd)
April 26, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF NOTIFICATION. The Clerk's Office has docketed Appellant's "Exhibits" in support of her Notice of Appeal. See Doc. 14 . Consistent with the Docket Entry corresponding with Appellant's Notice of Appeal (Appendix A) , the Clerk's Office has "certifie[d] the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries." Thus, any further submissions Appellant wishes to make in connection with her appeal of this Court's decision should be made directly to the Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. As a one-time courtesy, this Court's Clerk has notified the Court of Appeals regarding Appellant's Exhibits (Doc. 14 ). See Appendix B. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/26/13. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B) (dcd)
March 6, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Appellant has submitted to the Clerk's Office a document dated 2/28/13. See Feb. 28th Document (attached as Appendix hereto). The document's caption references the instant Civil Action Number (12-1900), but it incorrectly identifies District Judge Cercone as presiding judicial officer, and it requests that Judge Cercone recuse from the case. The undersigned, not Judge Cercone, however, is presiding in Civil Action No. 12-1900. In addition, Negley Park Homeowners Association Co uncil, referenced in the title of Appellant's February 28th document, has not been named as a party in Civil Action No. 12-1900, although it has been named as an appellee in other of Appellant's cases. As best as the undersigned can tell, A ppellant meant to file the February 28th document under a different civil action number. Because Appellant identified Civil Action No. 12-1900 in her caption, however, the document has been forwarded to the undersigned, and it has not been filed in any of Appellant's cases. The February 28th document, having been erroneously submitted under a caption identifying Civil Action No. 12-1900, is being returned to Appellant today, via First-Class U.S. Mail, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/6/13. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (dcd)
March 7, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Appellant's document dated 3/4/13, having by all appearances been erroneously submitted under a caption identifying Civil Action No. 12-1900, is being returned to Appellant today, via First-Class U.S. Mail, along with a copy of this Order . In the future, any documents submitted by Appellant that do not clearly identify the case in which she intends them to be filed will be returned to her by First-Class U.S. Mail, without further analysis or explanation. Given that Appellant's potential failure to comply with this Order may result in the return of her submissions by regular mail, Appellant is encouraged to retain copies of any documents she submits to the Court. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/7/13. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (dcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: TAYLOR v. WINNECOUR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RONDA WINNECOUR
Represented By: Ronda J. Winnecour
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CAROLE L. TAYLOR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]