EXCENTUS CORPORATION v. GIANT EAGLE, INC et al

Defendant: DAVID SHAPIRA, DANIEL SHAPIRA and GIANT EAGLE, INC
Plaintiff: EXCENTUS CORPORATION
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00178
Filed: February 1, 2013
 
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2013 125 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 106 , and denying, without prejudice, 107 and 110 as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/26/13. An appropriate order will follow. (kjm)
December 12, 2013 141 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION: For the reasons set forth in this opinion, Giant Eagle, Inc's motion for reconsideration 129 is granted. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/12/13. (kjm)
March 10, 2014 180 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re motion to sever and transfer 147 and motion to stay 160 . An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 3/10/14. (kjm)
March 24, 2014 183 Featured Case OPINION setting forth the reasons 91 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM will be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 3/24/14. (kjm)
July 10, 2014 208 Featured Case OPINION setting forth the reasons the motion for reconsideration 143 , motion to strike 157 , and motion to stay 158 will be DENIED. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 7/10/14. (kjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: EXCENTUS CORPORATION v. GIANT EAGLE, INC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SHAPIRA
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Represented By: Bernard D. Marcus
Represented By: Jonathan D. Marcus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL SHAPIRA
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Represented By: Bernard D. Marcus
Represented By: Jonathan D. Marcus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIANT EAGLE, INC
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Represented By: Bernard D. Marcus
Represented By: Jonathan D. Marcus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXCENTUS CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeremy A. Mercer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]