CARTER v. WINTRUBA et al

Defendant: THE BOROUGH OF HOMESTEAD PENNSYLVANIA, POLICE OFFICER TROUT, POLICE OFFICER STRANG, POLICE OFFICER SOPCAK, POLICE OFFICER WINTRUBA and THE BOROUGH OF WEST HOMESTEAD
Plaintiff: JASON L. CARTER
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00806
Filed: June 13, 2013
 
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER denying 4 Motion to Amend/Correct without prejudice; denying 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/25/2013. (mjl)
July 12, 2013 2 Featured Case ORDER that, on or before July 29, 2013, Plaintiff shall file with this Court a signed copy of the enclosed authorization form indicating whether he wishes to proceed with this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 07/12/2013. (bsc)
June 9, 2014 44 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER. At least four of the six Poulis factors weigh strongly in favor of dismissal. Accordingly, this action should be dismissed with prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Out of an abundance of caution, however, this Court will give Plaintiff one final opportunity to respond to the dispositive motions on or before June 23, 2014. Failing to do so, this Court will enter an order dismissing his case with prejudice and without further notice.Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/09/2014. (MJL)
June 27, 2014 45 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Motion to Dismiss to be Treated as a Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 28) filed on behalf of Police Officer James M. Wintruba, Police Officer John Sopcak, Police Officer Ian Strang and the Borough of Homestead, the Moti on to Dismiss (ECF No. 35) filed on behalf of the Borough of West Homestead and the West Homestead Police Department, and Police Officer Jason Trouts Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 39) are DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/27/2014. (MJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: CARTER v. WINTRUBA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOROUGH OF HOMESTEAD PENNSYLVANIA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER TROUT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER STRANG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER SOPCAK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER WINTRUBA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOROUGH OF WEST HOMESTEAD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON L. CARTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]