Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. v. TC Oil, Corp

Plaintiff: Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.
Defendant: TC Oil, Corp
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv01105
Filed: February 5, 2009
 
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: Adjuntas
Presiding Judge: Jaime Pieras, Jr
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:44 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2010 201 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING 153 MOTION for Judgment on the pleadings on portion of TC Oil's cunterclaim one, counterclaim three, portions of counterclaim five, and counterclaim seven filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Signed by Judge Jaime Pieras, Jr on 12/29/09.(su)
March 11, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER - GRANTING Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Defendant is ORDERED to surrender the Station and its equipment to Plaintiff and to comply with all post-termination covenants of the agreements between the parties. Answer to Complaint Deadline due by 3/26/2009. Signed by Judge Jaime Pieras, Jr. on 3/11/2009. (mld)
July 8, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING Defendant's 61 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jaime Pieras, Jr. on 7/7/2009. (mld)
July 30, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER - DENYING Defendant's 68 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Lanham Act Claims. Signed by Judge Jaime Pieras, Jr. on 7/29/2009. (mld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. v. TC Oil, Corp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.
Represented By: Lee Sepulvado-Ramos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TC Oil, Corp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]