MB Auto Care Management, Inc. v. Plaza Carolina Mall, L.P. et al

Plaintiff: MB Auto Care Management, Inc.
Defendant: Plaza Carolina Mall, L.P., SPG Carolina, L.P. and Simon PC, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01095
Filed: February 5, 2010
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: San Juan Office
County: Adjuntas
Presiding Judge: Salvador E Casellas
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1443(1) Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. DENIED 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Diversity Jurisdiction filed by MB Auto Care Management, Inc. Plaintiff is also reminded that their response/opposition to Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings is due today, 3/17/2010. Signed by Judge Salvador E Casellas on 3/17/2010.(LB)
April 20, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. GRANTED 10 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Salvador E Casellas on 4/20/2010. (LB)
December 16, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART 53 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Simon PC, Inc., Plaza Carolina Mall, L.P., SPG Carolina, L.P.; MOOT 26 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs filed by Simon PC, Inc., Plaza Carolina Mall, L.P., SPG Carolina, L.P. Signed by Judge Salvador E Casellas on 12/16/2010.(LB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MB Auto Care Management, Inc. v. Plaza Carolina Mall, L.P. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MB Auto Care Management, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaza Carolina Mall, L.P.
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPG Carolina, L.P.
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon PC, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]