Traudt, et al v. Huntress, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Scott Traudt, Neal Gartner, James. McNulty, John. McNulty, Susan Carr, Gavin Casey, James Christy, Carlos Herrera, John Mottola and Robert Kenyon
Defendant: Huntress, Inc and Relentless Inc
 
Case Number: 1:2003cv00241
Filed: June 16, 2003
 
Court: Rhode Island District Court
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Referring Judge: Lincoln D. Almond
Presiding Judge: Ronald R Lagueux
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2008 50 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiffs' Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss without prejudice be Denied 41 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Scott Traudt, James. McNulty, Robert Kenyon, John. McNulty, James Christy, Carlos Herrera, Neal Gartner, Gavin Casey, Susan Carr, John Mottola Objections to R&R due by 9/25/2008. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 9/11/08. (Noel, Jeannine)
November 7, 2008 51 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 50 . So Ordered by Judge Mary M Lisi on 11/7/08. (Gilfillan, Barbara)
January 7, 2009 54 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Document No. 52) be GRANTED in part and that the Court sua sponte GRANT partial cross-summary judgment for Plaintiff John Mottola as provided herein. Recommen ding that the District Court direct the Clerk to enter Final Judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs with the sole exception of Plaintiff John Mottola who shall be awarded partial judgment against Defendant Huntress, Inc., in the amoun t of $290.64, plus 6% per annum interest calculated from the date he joined this suit (December 8, 2006) to the date of entry of final judgment. 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Relentless Inc, Huntress, Inc Objections to R&R due by 1/22/2009. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/7/09. (Noel, Jeannine)
January 23, 2009 55 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Mary M Lisi on 1/23/09. (Gilfillan, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Traudt, et al v. Huntress, Inc., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Traudt
Represented By: Merlyn P. O'Keefe(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Gartner
Represented By: Merlyn P. O'Keefe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James. McNulty
Represented By: Merlyn P. O'Keefe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John. McNulty
Represented By: Merlyn P. O'Keefe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Carr
Represented By: Merlyn P. O'Keefe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavin Casey
Represented By: Merlyn P. O'Keefe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Christy
Represented By: Merlyn P. O'Keefe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Herrera
Represented By: Merlyn P. O'Keefe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mottola
Represented By: Merlyn P. O'Keefe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kenyon
Represented By: Merlyn P. O'Keefe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntress, Inc
Represented By: Martin K. DeMagistris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Relentless Inc
Represented By: Martin K. DeMagistris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]