Brown v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Carol Brown
Defendant: Menu Foods South Dakota, Inc, Menu Foods, Inc, Menu Foods Income Fund and Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv00115
Filed: March 27, 2007
 
Court: Rhode Island District Court
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Referring Judge: Lincoln D. Almond
Presiding Judge: Mary M Lisi
 
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2007 10
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Brown. Menu Foods Midwest Corporation served on 5/29/2007, answer due 6/18/2007. (Wasylyk, Peter)
July 24, 2007 11
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the District of New Jersey pursuant to the Rules of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Barletta, Barbara)
March 27, 2007 1
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing Fee $ 350.00; Receipt Number 65616), filed by Carol Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duhamel, John) Modified on 4/16/2007 to note that Page 10 of the instant complaint states a Jury Demand. The Civil Cover Sheet, however, does not. (Duhamel, John).
April 19, 2007 2
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Angelone on behalf of all defendants (Angelone, Thomas)
April 19, 2007 3
MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, with supporting memo by all defendants. Responses due by 5/7/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sexton Motion for Transfer and Coordination or Consolidation# 2 Exhibit Troiano Motion to Transfer and Coordination or Consolidate# 3 Exhibit Whaley Motion for Transfer and Coordination# 4 Exhibit Hearing Order)(Angelone, Thomas) Modified on 4/19/2007 to note that the corrected version of the instant supporting memorandum is Document 4. (Duhamel, John).
April 19, 2007 4
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Menu Foods, Inc, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods South Dakota, Inc. Amendment to 3 MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, corrected memorandum. (Angelone, Thomas)
May 9, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 3 Motion to Stay - So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 5/9/07. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 12, 2007 6
NOTICE by Menu Foods, Inc, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods South Dakota, Inc Filing of Conditional Transfer Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transfer Order)(Angelone, Thomas)
July 12, 2007 7
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Brown. Menu Foods, Inc served on 5/29/2007, answer due 6/18/2007. (Wasylyk, Peter)
July 12, 2007 8
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Brown. Menu Foods South Dakota, Inc served on 5/29/2007, answer due 6/18/2007. (Wasylyk, Peter)
July 12, 2007 9
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Brown. Menu Foods Income Fund served on 5/29/2007, answer due 6/18/2007. (Wasylyk, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brown v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Brown
Represented By: Peter N. Wasylyk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods South Dakota, Inc
Represented By: Thomas C. Angelone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc
Represented By: Thomas C. Angelone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Represented By: Thomas C. Angelone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Represented By: Thomas C. Angelone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]