D&H Therapy Associates, LLC et al v. Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: D&H Therapy Associates, LLC and Robin Dolan
Defendant: Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company
Counter_claimant: Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company
Counter_defendant: Robin Dolan
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00005
Filed: January 3, 2008
 
Court: Rhode Island District Court
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: David L. Martin
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 10/20/08. (Noel, Jeannine)
September 2, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is hereby granted, resulting in the dismissal of all counts. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on its counterclaim is denied. Plain tiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts III, IV and V of their Amended Complaint and on Defendant's Counterclaim is also denied. No judgments shall enter in this case until all claims are resolved. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 9/2/2009. (Smith, Rana)
March 8, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER as to 56 MOTION for Reconsideration With Supporting Memo by Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company and 61 MOTION for Reconsideration with Supporting Memo by all plaintiffs: The Court reaffirms is grant of summary judgment in De fendant's favor on all counts of Plaintiffs' Complaint, as well as its order denying Plaintiffs' partial motion for summary judgment on liability only on three counts of the Complaint; however, in reconsidering its earlier ruling, the Court has determined that it must grant Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on Defendant's counterclaim, which claim must be dismissed as a matter of law. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 3/8/10. (Jackson, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: D&H Therapy Associates, LLC et al v. Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D&H Therapy Associates, LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Beal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Dolan
Represented By: Charles S. Beal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brooks R. Magratten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brooks R. Magratten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Robin Dolan
Represented By: Charles S. Beal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]