Shapiro v. Roger Williams University et al

Plaintiff: Joshua Barrett Shapiro
Defendant: Roger Williams University, Roy J. Nirschel, Heidi Hartzell, Allison Chase-Padula, Tony Montefusco, Richard Stegman and Anthony M. Pesare
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00140
Filed: April 5, 2011
 
Court: Rhode Island District Court
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: Mary M Lisi
Referring Judge: David L. Martin
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 86 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court: Plaintiff's appeal is DENIED and the Magistrate Judge's order is AFFIRMED in all respects. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/25/2012. (A copy of the instant Memorandum and Order was forwarded via first-class mail to Plaintiff's California address.)(Duhamel, John)
June 12, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 116 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Joshua Barrett Shapiro. The Plaintiff is ordered to comply with Magistrate Judge Martin's 104 Order. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/12/2012. (A copy of the attached Memorandum and Order was forwarded via first-class mail to Plaintiff's California address.)(Duhamel, John)
August 17, 2012 147 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice (granting RWU's 112 Motion for Sanctions; 126 Motion for Final Judgment; 127 Motion to Dismiss; 132 Motion for Final Judgment. All other pending motions are terminated as moot.) So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/17/2012. (Duhamel, John)
November 29, 2012 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 153 Motion for Transcripts... -- So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/29/2012. (A copy of the instant order was forwarded to Plaintiff via first-class mail to Plaintiff's California address as it appears on the docket.) (Duhamel, John)
April 30, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 43 Motion for Summary Judgment as to the individually named defendants (Allison Chase-Padula, Heidi Hartzell, Tony Montefusco, Roy J. Nirschel, Anthony M. Pesare, and Richard Stegman) with respect to personal liability. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/30/2012. (A copy of the instant Memorandum and Order was forwarded via first-class mail to Plaintiff's California address.) (Duhamel, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Shapiro v. Roger Williams University et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Barrett Shapiro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Williams University
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy J. Nirschel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Hartzell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Chase-Padula
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Montefusco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stegman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony M. Pesare
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]