Ciprian v. City of Providence et al

Plaintiff: Fermin R. Ciprian
Defendant: City of Providence, Providence School Department, James J. Lombardi, Robert Wise, Maila Touray, Philip Gould, Grace Gonzalez, Magaly Sanchez, Ronnie Young, Brian Lalli, Melissa Malone and Katherine McKenzie
Case Number: 1:2012cv00651
Filed: September 17, 2012
Court: Rhode Island District Court
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Referring Judge: Lincoln D. Almond
Presiding Judge: Mary M. Lisi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 20 Motion to Dismiss (without prejudice) Plaintiff's claims against the following Defendants: Robert T. Wise, Maila Touray, Philip Gould, Grace Gonzalez, Magaly Sanchez, Ronnie Young, Brian Lalli, Melissa Malone, and Katherine McKenzie. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/31/2014. (Duhamel, John)
April 15, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Defendants' 18 Motion for Summary Judgment on the Plaintiff's claims of employment discrimination and retaliation under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/15/2014. (Duhamel, John)
April 21, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: DENYING/DISMISSING 28 MOTION for Relief from Judgment in accordance with U.S. Rules of Civil Procedure Rule No. 60(b((3); and, DENYING/DISMISSING as moot 30 MOTION to Assign to Calendar re 28 MOTION for Relief from Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/21/2015. (A copy of the attached Order was forwarded to pro se Plaintiff via first-class mail on 4/21/2015.) (Duhamel, John)
April 1, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion to Dismiss: For the reasons stated in the attached Order, the City of Providence's motion to dismiss the Complaint is DENIED with respect to the Title VII claims in Counts I and II, and GRANTED with respect to the RICRA claim in Count III. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/1/2013. (Duhamel, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ciprian v. City of Providence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fermin R. Ciprian
Represented By: Nicholas S. Gelfuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Providence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence School Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maila Touray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magaly Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Lalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.