Seguin v. Textron, Inc. et al

Defendant: The Rhode Island Supreme Court, Priscilla Glucksman, Peter F. Kilmartin, Dugan & Grady Law Associates, Textron, Inc., McIntyre Tate, LLP, The Rhode Island Office of Child Support, Lynch, Lynch & Friel, P.C., Patricia A. Murray-Raposa, Paul Suttell, Adler, Pollock & Sheehan, P.C., The Estate of Gilbert T. Rocha, The Rhode Island Family Court and Office of the Attorney General of Rhode Island
Plaintiff: Mary Seguin
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00012
Filed: January 10, 2013
 
Court: Rhode Island District Court
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Landya B McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2013 156 Featured Case ORDER: The Court GRANTS in part the requests for judicial notice set forth in document numbers 46 , 48 , 62 , 63 , 65 , 80 , 81 , 82 , 83 , 86 , and 99 , to the extent that the Court takes judicial notice of the existence of the articles, websites, blogs, court documents, and demographic statistics cited by Plaintiff and attached as exhibits to those motions and requests. The Court DENIES the remaining relief sought in document numbers 46 , 48 , 62 , 63 , 65 , 80 , 81 , 82 , [ 83], 86 , 99 , 126 , 128 , 141 , and 144 . (The Court denies Plaintiff's motions seeking hearings and/or referrals for investigations and prosecutions.) -- So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B McCafferty (New Hampshire) on 10/17/2013. (Duhamel, John)
October 17, 2013 157 Featured Case ORDER denying 127 Motion Challenging Exclusive New Hampshire's Exclusive Designated Authority To Sit in Rhode Island Conflict of Interest Recusal Cases; denying 137 Emergency and Expedited Motion to Recuse and Re-Assign; denying 139 Expedited Motion to Compel Mandatory Conflict Screening and Enforce 28 USC Sec 291, 292 and 295. -- So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B McCafferty (New Hampshire) on 10/17/2013. (Duhamel, John)
November 8, 2013 174 Featured Case ORDER adopting 158 Report and Recommendations and granting Defendants' 69 Motion for Temporary Stay, and 73 , 109 , 119 Joinder Motions for Temporary Stay; and, imposing in this case a limited filing restriction upon the Plaintiff as s et forth in the attached Order. -- Unless otherwise ordered by this court, Defendants need not respond to any notice, pleading, or motion currently pending or filed by Plaintiff after the date of this order while this filing restriction remains in effect. -- In addition, to the extent Plaintiff has included multiple distinct motions for relief of various kinds in her objection to the Report and Recommendation, those motions are all denied without prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Steven J McAuliffe (New Hampshire) on 11/6/2013. (Duhamel, John)
April 29, 2014 196 Featured Case ORDER granting 94 MOTION to Seal Documents: Unredacted Copy of Memorandum of Law in Support of 92 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, and the Unredacted Copy of Exhibit 2 in Support of the Memorandum. So Ordered by Judge Steven J McAuliffe (NH) on 4/25/2014. (Note: A copy of this Order was forwarded to Mary Seguin on 4/29/2014 via first-class mail to the last-known Texas and Canada addresses provided to the court by Ms. Seguin.) (Duhamel, John)
April 29, 2014 198 Featured Case ORDER granting 89 Motion to Dismiss; granting 91 Motion to Dismiss; granting 92 Motion to Dismiss; granting 93 Motion to Dismiss; granting 194 Motion to Dismiss (as filed at Document #46 in Seguin v. Suttell, CA 13-095JNL). All claims asserted against defendants Textron, Inc.; Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.; McIntyre Tate, LLP; (as to CA 13-012) and defendants Bedrosian, Capinieri, Chafee, Constantino, Forte, Giarrusso, Glucksman, Kilmartin, McCann, Santilli, and Suttell (as to CA 1 3-095) are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. -- Unless Plaintiff, within fourteen (14) days of this Order, shows good cause for her failure to serve defendants Hugh Clements, Steven O'Donnell, and Gero Meyersiek (as to CA 13-012) and defendants Peter Ki lmartin and the Office of the RI Attorney General, the RI Supreme Court, Priscilla Glucksman, The RI Child Support Office, the RI Family Court, Dugan & Grady Law Associates, former Family Court Judge Jeremiah, Lynch Lynch & Friel P.C., Gero Myersiek, Sophia Meyersiek a/k/a Sophia Karvunis, Patricia Murray-Raposa, and Family Court Judge Voccola (as to CA 13-095), all claims against these defendants will be dismissed without prejudice, the case will be closed, and judgment will be entered. -- (Note: A copy of this Order was forwarded to Mary Seguin on 4/29/2014 via first-class mail to the last-known Texas and Canada addresses provided to the court by Ms. Seguin.). So Ordered by Judge Steven J McAuliffe (NH) on 4/25/2014. (Duhamel, John)
April 29, 2014 199 Featured Case ORDER granting the following filing restriction motions: Documents 173 , 179 , and 180 ; and 195 (as filed at Document #91 in Seguin v. Suttell, CA 13-095). The permanent injunction is outlined on pages 6 through 8 of the attached Order. -- So Ordered by Judge Steven J McAuliffe (NH) on 4/25/2014. (Note: A copy of this Order was forwarded to Mary Seguin on 4/29/2014 via first-class mail to the last-known Texas and Canada addresses provided to the court by Ms. Seguin.) (Duhamel, John)
June 2, 2014 200 Featured Case ORDER dismissing case (for the reasons stated in the attached Order). Claims asserted against the following Defendants in Seguin v. Suttell (CA 13-095) are dismissed without prejudice: Providence Police Department Chief Hugh T. Clements, Gero Meyersi ek, and Rhode Island State Police Colonel Steven G. ODonnell. Claims against the following Defendants in Seguin v. Textron (CA 13-012) are dismissed without prejudice: Peter Kilmartin and the Office of the Rhode Island Attorney General, the Rhode Isl and Supreme Court, Priscilla Glucksman, the Rhode Island Child Support Office, the Rhode Island Family Court, Dugan & Grady Law Associates, former Family Court Judge Jeremiah, Lynch Lynch & Friel P.C., Gero Meyersiek, Sophia Meyersiek a/k/a Sophia Karvunis, Patricia Murray-Raposa, and Family Court Judge Voccola. All other claims in these consolidated cases are dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to the Court's 198 Order. -- So Ordered by Steven J McAuliffe on 6/2/2014. (Note: A copy of this Order was forwarded to Mary Seguin on 6/2/2014 via first-class mail to the last-known Texas and Canada addresses provided to the court by Ms. Seguin.)(Duhamel, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Seguin v. Textron, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rhode Island Supreme Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priscilla Glucksman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter F. Kilmartin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dugan & Grady Law Associates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McIntyre Tate, LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rhode Island Office of Child Support
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynch, Lynch & Friel, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Murray-Raposa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Suttell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adler, Pollock & Sheehan, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Gilbert T. Rocha
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rhode Island Family Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Attorney General of Rhode Island
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Seguin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]