Bricklayers and Allied Craftsmen Local Union No. 3 v. Union Stone, Inc. et al

Defendant: Nuzzo Campion Stone Enterprises, Inc. and Union Stone, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Allied Craftsmen Local Union No. 3
Case Number: 1:2013cv00138
Filed: March 1, 2013
Court: Rhode Island District Court
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Referring Judge: Lincoln D. Almond
Presiding Judge: Mary M. Lisi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185 Employee Pension Plan
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Union Stone, Inc: The parties are herewith put on notice that the Court will treat the motion to dismiss as a motion for summary judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56. -- The parties are instructed to submit all materials, if any, which they consider pertinent to the motion, on or before OCTOBER 7, 2013. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 9/20/2013. (Duhamel, John)
October 17, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Defendant Union Stone's 15 Motion to Dismiss (converted to a Motion for Summary Judgment); and, granting Plaintiff Local 3's 18 Motion to Amend the Complaint in order to add a claim against David Corriveault. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/17/2013. (Duhamel, John)
May 14, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 3 Motion to Dismiss Count II of the Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/14/2013. (Duhamel, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bricklayers and Allied Craftsmen Local Union No. 3 v. Union Stone, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuzzo Campion Stone Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Tine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Stone, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Allied Craftsmen Local Union No. 3
Represented By: Renee J. Bushey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]