Yusenko et al v. Lennar Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Oleg Yusenko and Jennifer Yusenko
Defendant: Lennar Corporation, Home Buyers Warranty Corporation, National Home Insurance Company and John Doe
 
Case Number: 0:2009cv02395
Filed: September 11, 2009
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2009 33 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE granting in part 24 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Stay, staying the action until 03/04/2010 and directing counsel to file a report regarding the status of the case at that time. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 12/04/09. (bshr, )
November 7, 2011 56 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL directing plaintiffs to notify the court of their desire to proceed with or without counsel within 15 days. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/07/2011. (bshr, )
November 8, 2011 60 Featured Case SUPERSEDING ORDER REGARDING WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL directing plaintiffs to notify the court of their desire to proceed with or without counsel within fifteen (15) days. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/08/2011. (bshr, )
November 16, 2011 65 Featured Case ORDER directing plaintiffs to respond to the 50 Joint MOTION for enforcement of settlement agreement within fourteen (14) days and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of the motion to the plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 09-2395. (bshr, )
January 13, 2012 78 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 01/13/2012. (bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Yusenko et al v. Lennar Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oleg Yusenko
Represented By: D Ryan McCabe, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Yusenko
Represented By: D Ryan McCabe, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar Corporation
Represented By: James Lynn Werner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Buyers Warranty Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Home Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]