Hartford Casualty Insurance Company v. Farley Associates, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Farley Associates, Inc., JJF Company, LLC, Catherine G Farley, Janis I Farley, James C Farley, Jr and James C Farley, III
 
Case Number: 0:2013cv00547
Filed: March 1, 2013
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: XUS, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying 18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 7/15/2013.(cbru, )
May 12, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Status Report due by 5/28/2014) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 5/12/2014. (cbru, )
August 25, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying 64 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 8/25/2014.(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company v. Farley Associates, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: William Richard Warnock, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farley Associates, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJF Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine G Farley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janis I Farley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C Farley, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C Farley, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]