Shippy v. Cherokee County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Shondreka Jacole Shippy
Defendant: Cherokee County Detention Center, Sgt Blackwell, Captain Anderson, Sheriff Mueller, Ms Margaret and Corporal Waters
Case Number: 0:2013cv01077
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Cherokee
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr (Other)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 25 Report and Recommendation. Defendants CCDC and Sheriff Mueller are dismissed from this action. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 9/23/2013.(abuc)
November 20, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff shall advise the court as to whether she wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to the defendants motion for summary judgment within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. Plaintiff is further advised that if she fails to respond, this action will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. (Response to Motion due by 12/4/2013.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 11/20/2013. (abuc)
January 31, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION incorporating 62 Report and Recommendation, dismissing this action with prejudice for failure to prosecute under Rule 41(b) and any outstanding motions are deemed moot. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 1/31/2014. (jpet, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shippy v. Cherokee County Detention Center et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shondreka Jacole Shippy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee County Detention Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Blackwell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Mueller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Margaret
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Waters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]