Bowers v. Cartledge

Respondent: Leroy Cartledge
Petitioner: James Bowers
Case Number: 0:2014cv00358
Filed: February 11, 2014
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: McCormick
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Leroy Cartledge. The petitioner shall advise the court as to whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to the respondent's motion f or summary judgment within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. The petitioner is further advised that if he fails to respond, this action will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. (Response to Motion due by 7/15/2014.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 7/1/2014. (abuc)
September 22, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment 14 is hereby DENIED and the matter is recommitted to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Richard M. Gergel on 9/22/2014. (gmil)
September 23, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Court finds that appointment of counsel is proper in these circumstances and hereby appoints Matthew Nickles of the Charleston County Bar as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/23/2014. (gmil)
September 24, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, The Respondent shall, on or before December 1, 2014, supplement his Return and Memorandum of Law to address the grounds raised in Bowers' Petition. In connection with his Return, the Respondent may also file another motion for summary judgment directed at the grounds of the Petition if he so desires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 9/24/2014. (gmil)
November 4, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 33 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Bowers. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall strike petitioner's pro se amended petition from the docket. The Clerk of Court is also directed to mail the petitioner the court's September 23, 2014, Order appointing him counsel in this matter. It is further ORDERED that counsel for the petitioner shall file the proposed pleading as granted by the court's October 27, 2014, Order as an Amended Petition on or before November 10, 2014. Modified to edit docket text on 11/4/2014 (gmil).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Cartledge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leroy Cartledge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Bowers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]