United States of America v. Grant

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Aretha F Grant
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00042
Filed: January 4, 2012
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Aiken Office
County: Aiken
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER granting 31 Motion to Stay Scheduling Order deadlines pending the resolution of the motion for partial summary judgment and motion to dismiss. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/23/2013.(asni, )
June 25, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER AND OPINION granting 23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/25/2013.(asni, )
July 15, 2013 45 Featured Case AMENDED SUMMARY JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Aretha F Grant with prejudice on account of her unpaid federal income tax liabilities for the 1999, 2000, 2001, 2002, 2003 and 2005 tax years in the amount of $277,202.09 as of November 26, 2012, plus interest from that date pursuant to 26 U.S.C. §§ 6621 and 6622. Post judgment interest shall run at the rate of.15%. The court having entered and order of dismissal as to plaintiff's claim to reduce to judgment defendants 2006, 2008, and 2009 tax liabilities it is further ordered these claims are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2). (asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Grant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John Douglas Barnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aretha F Grant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]