Keith v. Cartledge et al

Defendant: Larry Cartledge, Florence Mauney, Major Early, Rhonda Abston, Captain Degeorgis, Sergeant Eich, William R Byars, Jr and Jon Ozmint
Plaintiff: Trovon Aquarius Keith
Case Number: 1:2013cv01131
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Aiken Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 108 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 94 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Larry Cartledge, William R Byars, Jr, Florence Mauney, Major Early, Jon Ozmint, Captain Degeorgis, Rhonda Abston, Ms Harris, Sergeant Eich. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 79) is granted, and this case is dismissed with prejudice. All other pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/6/2014. (abuc)
September 30, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 59 Report and Recommendation. The Court denies Plaintiff's motions listed in the R&R. (Dkt. Nos. 19, 38, 40, 42, 45, 49, 52, 56). Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/30/2013. (abuc)
October 11, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 59 Report and Recommendation, denying 19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, denying 38 Motion for for Defendants to take Physical and Mental Examinations and a Blood Test, denying 40 Motion for Physical and Mental Examination of Persons in the Custody of Defendants, denying 42 Motion for Entry of Default, denying 45 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for TRO, denying 49 Motion for Entry of Default, denying 52 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and denying 56 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/11/2013. (jpet, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keith v. Cartledge et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Cartledge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence Mauney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Early
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Abston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Degeorgis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Eich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R Byars, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Ozmint
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trovon Aquarius Keith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]