Barton v. Williams et al

Defendant: Michael Marquardt, James Johnson, Jordan Williams, Wellington Williams and Ringold
Plaintiff: Jerman O Barton
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv02457
Filed: September 11, 2013
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Aiken Office
County: Dorchester
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 2/17/14. (vhor, )
April 2, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jordan Williams, Ringold, Michael Marquardt, Wellington Williams, James Johnson. Plaintiff has failed to respond to the motion. As such, it appears to the co urt that he does not oppose the motion and wishes to abandon this action. Plaintiff is directed to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment by April 16, 2014. Plaintiff is further advised that if he fails to respond, this action will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 4/2/2014. (abuc)
May 13, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 30 Report and Recommendation. This action is dismissed with prejudice for lack of prosecution. The Clerk shall docket the defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 25) as moot. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 5/13/2014.(abuc)
May 14, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT / The court has ordered that this action is dismissed with prejudice. (abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Barton v. Williams et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Marquardt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellington Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ringold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerman O Barton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]