Davis v. Brunson et al

Defendant: Cpl Benjamin, Cpt Brunson and Ms Davis
Plaintiff: Mildenzel M Davis
Case Number: 1:2013cv03458
Filed: December 12, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Aiken Office
County: Florence
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Allow Plaintiff to Deal with Defects in Service; denying 25 Motion to Allow Plaintiff to Deal with Defects in Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 2/20/2014.(abuc)
March 6, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 36 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #24) is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 3/6/2014.(abuc)
November 12, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING 64 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 49 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Mildenzel M Davis, 48 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Mildenzel M Davis, 51 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Cpt Brunson, Cpl Benjamin, Ms Davis. Defendants' motion for summary judgment, Doc. #51, is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed, and Plaintiff's pending motion for a physical and mental evaluation, Doc. #48, and motion to amend, Doc. #49, are terminated as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 11/12/2014. (abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Brunson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt Brunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildenzel M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.