craigslist Inc v. McMaster et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: craigslist Inc
Defendant: Henry D McMaster, David Pascoe, Barbara R Morgan, C Kelly Jackson, Jay E Hodge, Jr, W Barney Giese, Douglas A Barfield, Jr, Trey Gowdy, III, Jerry W Peace, Scarlet Wilson, Christina T Adams, Donald V Myers, Edgar L Clements, III, Robert M Ariall, I McDuffie Stone, III, Gregory Hembree and Kevin S Brackett
Case Number: 2:2009cv01308
Filed: May 20, 2009
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Charleston
Presiding Judge: C Weston Houck
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2010 42 REPLY by Christina T Adams, Robert M Ariall, Douglas A Barfield, Jr, Kevin S Brackett, Edgar L Clements, III, W Barney Giese, Trey Gowdy, III, Gregory Hembree, Jay E Hodge, Jr, C Kelly Jackson, Henry D McMaster, Barbara R Morgan, Donald V Myers, David Pascoe, Jerry W Peace, I McDuffie Stone, III, Scarlet Wilsonto 38 Supplement, 14 MOTION to Dismiss, 39 Supplement Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Viz Media v Spector case, # 2 Lackner v. Sanchez case, # 3 In Re Baxter case)(Smith, James)
March 17, 2010 41 REPLY by craigslist Incto 38 Supplement, 40 Order, 39 Supplement. (Griffith, Joseph)
March 11, 2010 40 TEXT ORDER: Per the Court's instructions at the hearing on February 23, 2010, any replies to the parties' supplemental briefs will be due on March 17, 2010. Entered at the direction of Honorable C Weston Houck on 03/11/10. (mjt)
March 10, 2010 39 SUPPLEMENT by craigslist Inc to 38 Supplement, 26 Reply to Response to Motion, 23 Response in Opposition to Motion, 14 MOTION to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Addendum unpublished case)(Griffith, Joseph)
March 10, 2010 38 SUPPLEMENT by Christina T Adams, Robert M Ariall, Douglas A Barfield, Jr, Kevin S Brackett, Edgar L Clements, III, W Barney Giese, Trey Gowdy, III, Gregory Hembree, Jay E Hodge, Jr, C Kelly Jackson, Henry D McMaster, Barbara R Morgan, Donald V Myers, David Pascoe, Jerry W Peace, I McDuffie Stone, III, Scarlet Wilson to 14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction. (Smith, James)
March 5, 2010 37 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING held on February 23, 2010, before Judge HONORABLE C. WESTON HOUCK. Court Reporter/Transcriber O'Brien/Janet Collins. Tape Number: Court Smart. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction.. Redaction Request due 3/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2010. (obri, )
February 23, 2010 35 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable C Weston Houck: Motion Hearing held on 2/23/2010 re 14 MOTION to Dismiss. Attorneys to submit additional briefs within 2 weeks. Court Reporter Gil O'Brien. (erav, )
February 11, 2010 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable C Weston Houck on 2/11/2010.(vdru )
February 11, 2010 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick J. Carome ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-2546905) by craigslist Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/1/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Application with attachments)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Griffith, Joseph)
February 8, 2010 31 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING on motion to dismiss previously set for Feb. 19, 2010 rescheduled to: Motion Hearing on motion to dismiss set for 2/23/2010 at 11:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #4, U. S. Court House, 85 Broad St, Charleston before Honorable C Weston Houck. (vdru)
February 5, 2010 30 Featured Case ORDER granting Attorney Joseph P. Griffith Jr.'s request for protection. Attorney Griffith is protected from court appearances in this case from March 2, 2010 -March 31, 2010.Signed by Honorable C Weston Houck on 2/5/2010. (vdru)
February 5, 2010 29 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 14 MOTION to Dismiss :Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2010 11:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #4, U. S. Court House, 85 Broad St, Charleston before Honorable C Weston Houck. (vdru, )
February 4, 2010 28 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Joseph P Griffith, Jr for 3-2-2010 to 3-31-2010 (Griffith, Joseph)
September 17, 2009 27 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by James Emory Smith, Jr for October 12-16, 2009 Request for Protection for Deborah Shupe (Smith, James)
September 11, 2009 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Christina T Adams, Robert M Ariall, Douglas A Barfield, Jr, Kevin S Brackett, Edgar L Clements, III, W Barney Giese, Trey Gowdy, III, Gregory Hembree, Jay E Hodge, Jr, C Kelly Jackson, Henry D McMaster, Barbara R Morgan, Donald V Myers, David Pascoe, Jerry W Peace, I McDuffie Stone, III, Scarlet Wilson. (Smith, James)
September 11, 2009 25 TEXT ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by the Honorable C Weston Houck on September 11, 2009. (pque,)
September 11, 2009 24 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Christina T Adams, Robert M Ariall, Douglas A Barfield, Jr, Kevin S Brackett, Edgar L Clements, III, W Barney Giese, Trey Gowdy, III, Gregory Hembree, Jay E Hodge, Jr, C Kelly Jackson, Henry D McMaster, Barbara R Morgan, Donald V Myers, David Pascoe, Jerry W Peace, I McDuffie Stone, III, Scarlet Wilson. Response to Motion due by 9/29/2009 No proposed order(Smith, James)
August 31, 2009 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants. Response filed by craigslist Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/11/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Griffith, Joseph)
August 31, 2009 22 TEXT ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by the Honorable C Weston Houck on August 31, 2009. (pque, )
August 31, 2009 21 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by craigslist Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/18/2009 No proposed order(Griffith, Joseph)
August 24, 2009 20 TEXT ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by the Honorable C Weston Houck on August 24, 2009.(pque, )
August 21, 2009 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Trey Gowdy, III, Jerry W Peace, Scarlet Wilson, Christina T Adams, Donald V Myers, Edgar L Clements, III, Robert M Ariall, I McDuffie Stone, III, Gregory Hembree, Kevin S Brackett, Henry D McMaster, David Pascoe, Barbara R Morgan, C Kelly Jackson, Jay E Hodge, Jr, W Barney Giese, Douglas A Barfield, Jr. Response to Motion due by 9/8/2009 No proposed order(Smith, James)
August 5, 2009 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss until 8/31/09. Signed by Honorable C Weston Houck on 8/5/09.(jwol, )
July 30, 2009 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by craigslist Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/17/2009 No proposed order(Griffith, Joseph)
July 21, 2009 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Trey Gowdy, III, Jerry W Peace, Scarlet Wilson, Christina T Adams, Donald V Myers, Edgar L Clements, III, Robert M Ariall, I McDuffie Stone, III, Gregory Hembree, Kevin S Brackett, Henry D McMaster, David Pascoe, Barbara R Morgan, C Kelly Jackson, Jay E Hodge, Jr, W Barney Giese, Douglas A Barfield, Jr. Response to Motion due by 8/10/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support)No proposed order(Smith, James)
May 29, 2009 12 Letter from Joe Griffith Jr and J Emory Smith confirming their understanding of the conference call held with Judge Houck and counsel. (jwol, )
May 22, 2009 8 CONSENT ORDER that until the Court rules on the merits of craigslist's claims, Defendants and their attorneys and staffs shall refrain from initiating or pursuing any prosecution against craigslist website. Signed by Honorable C Weston Houck on 5/22/09. (jwol, )
May 22, 2009 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED AS TO USA, and all Defendants by craigslist Inc re 1 Complaint, 6 Summons Issued, Defendants' Answer due by 7/22/09, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Defendants' Acceptance of Service)(Griffith, Joseph) Modified on 5/26/2009 to correct event type (jwol, ).
May 20, 2009 6 Summons Issued as to Trey Gowdy, III, Jerry W Peace, Scarlet Wilson, Christina T Adams, Donald V Myers, Edgar L Clements, III, Robert M Ariall, I McDuffie Stone, III, Gregory Hembree, Kevin S Brackett, Henry D McMaster, David Pascoe, Barbara R Morgan, C Kelly Jackson, W Barney Giese, Douglas A Barfield, Jr. (jwol, )
May 20, 2009 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by craigslist Inc.(jwol, )
May 20, 2009 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by craigslist Inc. (jwol, )
May 20, 2009 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by craigslist Inc. Response to Motion due by 6/8/2009 Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.
May 20, 2009 1 COMPLAINT against Trey Gowdy, III, Jerry W Peace, Scarlet Wilson, Christina T Adams, Donald V Myers, Edgar L Clements, III, Robert M Ariall, I McDuffie Stone, III, Gregory Hembree, Kevin S Brackett, Henry D McMaster, David Pascoe, Barbara R Morgan, C Kelly Jackson, Jay E Hodge, Jr, W Barney Giese, Douglas A Barfield, Jr ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 2103288.), filed by craigslist Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-M, # 2 Declaration of Bart Daniel, # 3 Declaration of Jim Buckmaster, # 4Declaration of Joe Griffith)(jwol, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: craigslist Inc v. McMaster et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: craigslist Inc
Represented By: Joseph P Griffith, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry D McMaster
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pascoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara R Morgan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Kelly Jackson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay E Hodge, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Barney Giese
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas A Barfield, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trey Gowdy, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry W Peace
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scarlet Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina T Adams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald V Myers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar L Clements, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M Ariall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I McDuffie Stone, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Hembree
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin S Brackett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]