First Chatham Bank v. Landers et al

Defendant: Michael D Lang and Christopher T Landers
Plaintiff: First Chatham Bank
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00238
Filed: January 28, 2011
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Charleston
Presiding Judge: Patrick Michael Duffy
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 5/03/2011.(jlin, )
September 29, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 9/29/2011.(jlin, )
September 29, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court SUMMARY JUDGMENT in favor of First Chatham Bank against Christopher T Landers. (alan, )
November 3, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 11/3/2011.(jlin, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: First Chatham Bank v. Landers et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Lang
Represented By: Lindsey W Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Mallory Anne Lopata
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher T Landers
Represented By: Lindsey W Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Mallory Anne Lopata
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Chatham Bank
Represented By: Morgan S Templeton
Represented By: Taylor Harrison Stair
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]