McCrief v. Wachovia Bank et al

Plaintiff: Almia J McCrief
Defendant: Wachovia Bank and Bank of America
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00072
Filed: January 6, 2012
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Charleston
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2013 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 123 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Bruce Howe Hendricks; granting in part and denying in part 100 Motion to Dismiss; granting 101 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims for civil co nspiracy are therefore dismissed with prejudice, but Plaintiff's claim against Wells Fargo for breach of contract may proceed. Since all claims against Bank of America are dismissed, the Clerk is directed to terminate Bank of America as a party to this action. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/4/2013.(ssam, )
October 2, 2014 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ADOPTING 180 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Wallace W Dixon GRANTING 156 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Wachovia Bank, and DISMISSING this action for lack of prosecution Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/1/2014. (sshe, )
July 24, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 40 Report and Recommendationsof Magistrate Judge Bruce Howe Hendricks, denying 21 Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 7/24/12.(hhil, )
March 6, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 86 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 58 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Wachovia Bank, 46 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Bank of America. The Court dismisses Plaintiffs claim s against Defendants for fraud, conversion, and violation of the South Carolina Uniform Commercial Code. Plaintiffs breach of contract claim is dismissed as to BofA but may proceed as to Wells Fargo. Finally, the Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend his complaint, within fifteen days of this order, to allege special damages regarding his claim for civil conspiracy. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/6/2013. (sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McCrief v. Wachovia Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Almia J McCrief
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Bank
Represented By: Trudy Hartzog Robertson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: R Michael Ethridge
Represented By: John Thomas Floyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]