Burris v. North Charleston Police Department et al

Defendant: Thomas Eugene Bennett, Det Sturkie, Det Terry, Darin Cobb, Scott Micheal Thomes, North Charleston Police Department and Det Ware
Plaintiff: Shawn Justin Burris
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00699
Filed: March 15, 2013
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Charleston
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: G Ross Anderson
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr (Other)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER adopting 22 Report and Recommendation. It is ordered that the case is dismissed as to Defendant North Charleston Police Department without prejudice and without issuance or service of process. Signed by Honorable G Ross Anderson, Jr on 6/13/2013.(abuc)
September 9, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER denying 42 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 43 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; denying 50 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; denying 51 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 52 Motion to Amend/Correct; grant ing 53 Motion to Stay to the extent noted in order; denying 55 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time to the extent noted in order; denying 27 Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 9/9/2013.(abuc)
December 12, 2013 74 Featured Case ORDER denying 63 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; denying 66 Motion to Compel; granting 73 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Response to Motion due by 3/27/2014.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 12/12/2013.(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Burris v. North Charleston Police Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Eugene Bennett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det Sturkie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det Terry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin Cobb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Micheal Thomes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Charleston Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det Ware
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Justin Burris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]