USA v. Anderson

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Dorothy Lee Anderson
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00510
Filed: March 3, 2010
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2010 14 Featured Case JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION ORDER AGAINST DOROTHY LEE ANDERSON d/b/a DL ANDERSON TAX SERVICE granting 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 12 Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction directing that judgment is entered in favor of the United States against Dorothy Lee Andersond/b/a DL Anderson Tax Service. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 05/04/2010.(bshr, )
September 13, 2010 34 Featured Case ORDER directing defendant Dorothy Lee Anderson to appear for her deposition on 09/24/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom #6 at the U.S. District Courthouse, 901 Richland Street, Columbia, S.C., to truthfully and completely answer all questions pertaining to this case, and is directed to bring with her any records, documents, bank statements, and the like requested by the government. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 09/13/2010. (bshr, )
October 1, 2010 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Motion to Compel Defendant to Appear for a Continued Deposition and for Sanctions, finding defendant Dorothy Lee Anderson in contempt for failing to comply with this Court's order and refusing to answer the Government& #039;s questions during her deposition on September 24, 2010, directing defendant to appear for her continued deposition on Friday, October 15, 2010 at 10 A.M. in courtroom #4 at the U.S. District Courthouse, 901 Richland Street, Columbia, S.C., and directing defendant not to leave thecountry until further notice. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 10/01/2010.(bshr, )
January 24, 2011 78 Featured Case ORDER denying 65 Motion to Dismiss; denying 66 MOTION for Forthcoming Bond / Mortgage Bond / Private Property Bond per Claim Property Bond; granting 73 Motion for Sanctions, direct the USA to serve a copy of this order u pon defendant Anderson, notifying the Court will impose sanctions upon defendant Anderson for contemptuous conduct, and directing that defendant Anderson is to appear on 02/09/2011 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom IV, United States Courthouse, Matthew J. Perr y, Jr. Courthouse, 901 Richland Street, Columbia, SouthCarolina 29201 to demonstrate to this Court that she has complied with this Court's May 5, 2010 Order and to pay her fine. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 01/21/2011.(bshr, )
February 11, 2011 86 Featured Case ORDER notifying defendant she must appear for a hearing 02/22/2011 at 9:30 AM for the Court to determine if defendant should be held in criminal contempt, advising defendant she has the right to an attorney at her own expense, and directing defendant to bring any documents and witnesses she believes would provide evidentiary support for her case. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 02/11/2011. (bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: USA v. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: John Douglas Barnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Lee Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]