Dash v. Mayweather et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Lawrence Dash
Defendant: Floyd Mayweather, Jr, Mayweather Promotions, Mayweather Promtions LLC, Philthy Rich Records Inc and World Wrestling Entertainment Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv01036
Filed: April 26, 2010
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Orangeburg
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2011 131 Featured Case ORDER granting 112 Motion for Sanctions, ordering defendant Mayweather to perform 40 hours of community service at the Las Vegas Habitat for Humanity Project by January 31st, 2012. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/07/2011.(bshr, )
November 16, 2011 136 Featured Case ORDER modifying 131 Order granting Motion for Sanctions directing defendant Mayweather to perform (20) hours of community service with the Las Vegas Habitat for Humanity Project as provided in the previous order and directing Mayweather to perform ten (10) hours of community service with both the Las Vegas Rescue Mission and the Three Square Food Bank by January 31, 2012. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/16/2011. (bshr, )
December 1, 2011 138 Featured Case ORDER OF COURT MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER granting in part 89 MOTION to Compel Discovery/for Modification of 78 Case Management Order of June 8, 2011: Directing Defendants to submit partial summary judgment motions on the issue of Plaintiff's entitlement to actual damages and/or a profits-based measure of damages pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 504(b) forty-five (45) days from the entry of this Order, that Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition shall bedue sevent y-five (75) days from the entry of this Order, and that Defendants' Reply Briefs will be due ninety (90) days from the date of this Order, and staying all other deadlines contained in the 84 Third Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 12/01/2011.(bshr, )
February 1, 2012 148 Featured Case ORDER extending deadline for Defendant Floyd Mayweather to complete community service to May 31, 2012. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 02/01/2012. (bshr, )
May 11, 2012 172 Featured Case ORDER granting 143 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 145 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing as moot 95 Motion for Protective Order; dismissing as moot 96 Motion to Quash; dismissing as moot 100 Motion to Compel; dismissing as moot 125 Motion for Extension of Time; dismissing as moot 126 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 05/11/2012.(bshr, )
June 27, 2012 179 Featured Case ORDER denying 175 Motion for Reconsideration order granting Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment on Actual Damages and Profit Damages. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 06/27/2012.(bshr, )
August 25, 2010 36 Featured Case ORDER denying 22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or, in the alternative, to Transfer Case; denying 24 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and notifying Plaintiff Dash he has until 10/25/2010 to serve all unserved parties. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 08/25/2010.(bshr, )
September 13, 2010 39 Featured Case ORDER denying 37 Motion for Reconsideration of 36 36 denying Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or, in the alternative, to Transfer Case. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 09/13/2010.(bshr, )
March 8, 2011 60 Featured Case CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 59 Motion for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 03/08/2011.(bshr, )
June 8, 2011 78 Featured Case ORDER granting 61 Motion to Compel by plaintiff Anthony Lawrence Dash; granting 62 Motion to Compel by defendant World Wrestling Entertainment ; denying 62 Motion for Protective Order by defendant World Wrestling Entertainment. Court will grant the oral motion by parties to amend the scheduling order. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 6/8/11.(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dash v. Mayweather et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Lawrence Dash
Represented By: John Gressette Felder, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Mayweather, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayweather Promotions
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayweather Promtions LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philthy Rich Records Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Wrestling Entertainment Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]