Pure Fishing Inc v. Normark Corporation

Plaintiff: Pure Fishing Inc
Defendant: Normark Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv02140
Filed: August 16, 2010
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: XUS, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2012 195 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 155 MOTION to Amend/Correct 60 AMENDED COMPLAINT to the extent it seeks to add a claim under the doctrine of equivalents. (Amended Complaint due by 8/2/2012) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 7/26/2012. (cbru, )
September 12, 2012 262 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 208 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 9/12/2012.(cbru, )
December 11, 2012 278 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and finding as moot in part 201 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 203 Motion in Limine; denying 207 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 12/11/2012.(cbru, )
April 10, 2013 301 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 292 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 4/10/2013.(cbru, )
January 21, 2014 375 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 351 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 352 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 353 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 1/21/2014.(cbru, )
October 28, 2014 398 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 391 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/28/2014.(cbru, )
October 26, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER (partial Claim Construction ruling). Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/26/2011. (cbru, )
November 7, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's request to bar Plaintiff from offering Dr. Rubenstein as a claim construction witness is granted. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 11/7/2011. (cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pure Fishing Inc v. Normark Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Fishing Inc
Represented By: James H Fowles, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Normark Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]