Evans v. Columbia, City of

Plaintiff: Patricia A Evans
Defendant: Columbia, City of
Case Number: 3:2011cv00826
Filed: April 6, 2011
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
0 Judge: Joseph F Anderson
1 Judge: J Michelle Childs
2 Judge: William B Traxler
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Designation of a Three-Judge Panel, designating Judge Joseph F. Anderson, Jr., Judge William B. Traxler, and Judge J. Michelle Childs to constitute a District Court of three judges as provided by 28 U.S.C. 2284. Signed by Honorable William B Traxler on 04/14/2011.(bshr, )
October 19, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO BRIEF ISSUE instructing counsel to to brief the issue of whether the present action presents this court with a justiciable case or controversy. Briefs due by 11/02/2011. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 10/19/2011. (bshr, )
December 13, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE AS MOOT finding as moot 42 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 43 Motion for Summary Judgment, and dismissing the action without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 12/13/2011.(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Columbia, City of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A Evans
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Karl S Bowers, Jr
Represented By: Kevin A Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia, City of
Represented By: Peter M Balthazor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]