Richard S et al v. Sebelius et al

Defendant: South Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, John Doe 1 through 20, CMS, Anthony Keck, Kathleen Sebelius and Cynthia Mann
Plaintiff: Mary S, Nancy S, Rob L and Richard S
Case Number: 3:2012cv00007
Filed: January 1, 2012
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2014 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 102 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting summary judgment to Defendant SCDHHS as to the first cause of action alleged by Levin for violation of statutory and constitutional due process, as to the the second cause of action for violation of the SC Administrative Procedure Act as to the fifth cause of action for violation of the Medicaid Act, and dismissing all causes of action against Defendant Keck in his official capacity; denying in part [103 ] Motion for Summary Judgment, declining to issue a declaratory judgment ruling as to claims made by Stogsdill and finding that relief sought from the order issued by the South Carolina Court of Appeals is barred from consideration by this Court unde r Rooker-Feldman; and directing parties to provide the Court with additional briefing as the claims still remaining to be tried before a jury related to plaintiff Levin within fourteen (14) days of this order with such briefs not to exceed twenty (20) pages. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 11/10/2014.(bshr, )
May 25, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint within 10 days of this order in compliance with this order. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 5/25/12.(gpre, )
February 11, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying alternative Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 2/11/2013.(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard S et al v. Sebelius et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Health and Human Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1 through 20
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Keck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Mann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary S
Represented By: Patricia L Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy S
Represented By: Patricia L Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob L
Represented By: Patricia L Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard S
Represented By: Patricia L Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]