Lanier et al v. Branch Bank & Trust et al

Appellee: Bayview Loan Servicing LLC and Branch Bank & Trust
Appellant: Cathy G Lanier and Randy D Lanier
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00416
Filed: February 14, 2012
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Lexington
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
 
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER denying 3 Motion to Stay; denying 15 Motion to Stay Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 2/28/2012.(abuc)
March 2, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER denying 22 Motion for Reconsideration re 18 Order on Motion to Stay, filed by Randy D Lanier, Cathy G Lanier Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 3/2/2012.(abuc)
March 22, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 34 Report and Recommendation. The court affirms Judge Waites' January 3,2012 Order dismissing Appellants' Chapter 13 bankruptcy case with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 3/21/2013. (asni, )
February 16, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER The Appellants shall serve and file their brief within 14 days from the entry on the docket of this order pursuant to Rule 8007 and Rule 8009 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. The Appellees shall serve and fi le their briefs within 14 days after service of the brief of the Appellants. The Appellants may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the briefs of the Appellees. Appellees are directed to file a response to the motion by February 24, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 2/16/2012. (abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lanier et al v. Branch Bank & Trust et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: David Randolph Whitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Branch Bank & Trust
Represented By: John A Pincelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cathy G Lanier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Randy D Lanier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]