Lovett v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al

Plaintiff: Willie Lovett
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, EMC Mortgage Company, Real Time Solutions, Residential Credit Solutions, Aames Funding Corporation, All Persons and Entities Claiming Any Interest in Subject Real Property and Does 1-10
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv01816
Filed: July 2, 2012
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion for TRO; denying 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 13 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 8/1/2012.(abuc)
March 6, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 46 Report and Recommendation. RTR and EMC's motions to dismiss 29 , 32 are granted to the extent they seek the court to abstain from exercising jurisdiction.The within action is administratively stayed pending resolution of the foreclosure complaint in the Court of Common Pleas for Richland County, South Carolina, denying 37 Motion to Consolidate Cases. RTR and EMC shall file a status report every 90 days until the foreclosure complaint is resolved, commencing 90 days from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 3/6/2013. (asni, )
February 24, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 70 Report and Recommendation and dismissing complaint with prejudcie as to all defendants. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 2/21/2014. (mdea ) (Main Document 72 replaced on 2/24/2014) (mdea, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lovett v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Lovett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Time Solutions
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aames Funding Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons and Entities Claiming Any Interest in Subject Real Property
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]