JPMorgan Chase Bank NA v. Guertin et al

Counter_defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Defendant: Timothy R Guertin and Robin Guertin
Counter_claimant: Timothy R Guertin and Robin Guertin
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv02363
Filed: August 17, 2012
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Kershaw
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER AND OPINION granting 16 Motion to Dismiss defendants' counterclaim. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 11/15/2012.(asni, )
August 20, 2013 57 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING STAY OF CASE extending stay imposed by 53 Consent Order to 10/18/2013 and directing counsel for Plaintiff to provide the court a report describing the status of negotiations between the parties to resolve the case. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 08/20/2013. (bshr, )
April 9, 2014 91 Featured Case ORDER granting 83 Motion for Summary Judgment, dismissing the action with prejudice, and directing that the total amount due under the Note as of this date is $203,460.63 with post-judgment interest to accrue in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1961. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 04/09/2014.(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA v. Guertin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: James Y Becker
Represented By: Hamilton Osborne, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Hamilton Osborne, Jr
Represented By: James Y Becker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy R Guertin
Represented By: Brian L Boger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Guertin
Represented By: Brian L Boger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Timothy R Guertin
Represented By: Brian L Boger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Robin Guertin
Represented By: Brian L Boger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]