Evanston Insurance Company v. Watts et al

Defendant: Agape Senior LLC, Dora Elizabeth B Hanna, Jackson & Coker Locum Tenens LLC, Scott Middleton, Agape Senior Primary Care Inc, Vickie Watts and Meredith Wofford
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv00655
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: XUS, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 89 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 04/15/2014.(bshr, )
October 2, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Cross Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 119 & 131 ), notifying parties the Court will conduct a status conference with all parties to this action, as well as all pending related cases, for explanation and review of this Order and the Court's rulings on the applicable coverages contained in the policy. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 10/02/2014.(bshr, )
October 21, 2014 148 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re Cross Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 119 & 131 ), ruling on the applicable coverages contained in the policy. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 10/21/2014. (bshr, )
July 3, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendant Vickie Watts to notify the court of the identity of her new counsel or her desire to proceed without an attorney within thirty (30) days. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 07/03/2013. (bshr, )
February 10, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 72 Motion for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 02/10/2014.(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Insurance Company v. Watts et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agape Senior LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Elizabeth B Hanna
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson & Coker Locum Tenens LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Middleton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agape Senior Primary Care Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Watts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Wofford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Kylie Marie Inman Holladay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]