State of South Carolina, The v. Hitachi Displays Ltd et al

Plaintiff: State of South Carolina, The
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corp, Hitachi Displays Ltd and Sharp Corporation
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00899
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
 
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2013 12 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER FOR LIMITED REMAND AS TO HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD granting 8 Motion to Remand as to Defendant Hitachi Displays, remanding the State's claims against Defendant Hitachi Displays, Ltd. to the Richland County Court of Common Pleas. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 04/15/2013.(bshr, )
August 20, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER denying 18 Motion to Serve Defendant Epson Imaging Devices Corp. through its United States Counsel. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 08/20/2013.(bshr, )
January 2, 2014 33 Featured Case ORDER denying 30 Motion to Stay, denying South Carolina's motion to extend the stay to include Epson and directing South Carolina to respond to Epson's motion to dismiss no later than January 14, 2014. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 01/02/2014.(bshr, )
January 10, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER denying 34 MOTION for Reconsideration of 33 Order denying Motion to Stay, allowing parties to conduct discovery limited to personal until February 23, 2014. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr on 01/10/2014.(bshr, ). Modified on 1/10/2014 to replace order with corrected version per the direction of Judge Anderson's Chambers(bshr, ).
January 21, 2014 38 Featured Case ORDER remanding the action to the Richland County Court of Common Pleas, Fifth Judicial Circuit of South Carolina. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr on 01/21/2014. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court (bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: State of South Carolina, The v. Hitachi Displays Ltd et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Carolina, The
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Represented By: Thomas Travis Medlock
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Represented By: Clyde Havird Jones, Jr
Represented By: Jenny Anderson Draffin
Represented By: Nathaniel Heyward Clarkson, III
Represented By: Susan F Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays Ltd
Represented By: Peter D Protopapas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence Michael Hershon
Represented By: Ronald James Tryon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]