Glenn v. Grifth et al

Defendant: Kesha Williams, Kimberly Grifth and Gloreya Griffis
Plaintiff: Andres Leroy Glenn
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01195
Filed: May 1, 2013
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2013 15 Featured Case OPINION and ORDER adopting 10 Report and Recommendation. This action is dismissed without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 6/5/2013.(abuc) Modified to edit text on 6/5/2013 (abuc).
June 5, 2013 16 Featured Case JUDGMENT / The court orders that this case is dismissed without prejudice. (abuc)
October 9, 2013 20 Featured Case OPINION and ORDER denying 19 Motion for Copies. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/9/2013.(abuc)
May 16, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Motions granted: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) filed by Andres Leroy Glenn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 5/16/2013. (abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Glenn v. Grifth et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kesha Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Grifth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloreya Griffis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Leroy Glenn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]