Days Inns Worldwide Inc v. JBS Inc II et al

Plaintiff: Days Inns Worldwide Inc
Defendant: JBS Inc II, Jonathan B Smith and Marci Singleton Smith
 
Case Number: 4:2008cv01771
Filed: May 1, 2008
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Contract: Franchise Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2010 53 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's 45 MOTION to Strike and 49 MOTION to Strike be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth, and that Defendants Answer be stricken only as to JBS,Inc., II, and that default be entered only as to JBS, Inc., II. Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/20/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(dsto, )
February 19, 2010 59 Featured Case ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Court accepts 53 Report and Recommendation Plaintiff's 45 Motion to Strike, filed by Days Inns Worldwide Inc, 49 Motion to Strike, filed by Days Inns Worldwide Inc are granted in part and denied in part. The defendants' answer is hereby stricken as to defendant JBS, Inc., II, and default is hereby entered as to defendant JBS, Inc., II. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 2/19/10. (swel, )
July 8, 2010 66 Featured Case ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is hereby ORDERED that the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED 63 . For the reasons articulated by the Magistrate Judge, the plaintiffs motion to strike isGRANTED 55 . The answer is hereby stricken as to individual defendants Jonathan B. Smith and Marci Singleton Smith, and default is hereby entered as to individual defendants Jonathan B. Smith and Marci Singleton Smith. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 07/08/2010. (dsto, )
February 7, 2011 84 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that plaintiff's 70 Motion for Damages Hearing be granted as to Defendant Marci Singleton Smith and that default judgment be entered against Defendant Marci Singleton Smith in the amount of $127,792.02. Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/07/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to File Objections)(dsto, )
March 31, 2011 91 Featured Case ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is hereby ORDERED that the Magistrate Judges Report is ACCEPTED 84 . For the reasons articulated by the Magistrate Judge, default judgment is entered against defendant MarciSingleton Smith in the amount of $127,792.02. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 03/31/2011. (dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Days Inns Worldwide Inc v. JBS Inc II et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Days Inns Worldwide Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS Inc II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan B Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marci Singleton Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]