Addy's Harbor Dodge LLC v. Global Vehicles USA Incorporated et al

Defendant: John A Perez, Manuel Baez and Global Vehicles USA Incorporated
Plaintiff: Addy's Harbor Dodge LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv01065
Filed: May 3, 2011
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant Baez's renewed motion to dismiss, ECF No. 82 , is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Perez's renewed motion to dismiss, E CF No. 89 , is also GRANTED. Defendant Baez and Defendant Perez are DISMISSED, without prejudice. The parties should submit a proposed consent amended scheduling order consistent with this case being subject to trial during the Courts July 2014 term, with jury selection on July 31, 2014. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 5/5/2014. (mcot, )
September 30, 2014 149 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Plaintiff is entitled to costs and attorneys' fees in an amount to be determined. No later than October 14, 2014, counsel for AHD shall submit an appropriately supported motion for attorneys' fees and application for costs in accordance with applicable case law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 9/30/2014. (mcot, )
October 26, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 10/26/2011. (hcic)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addy's Harbor Dodge LLC v. Global Vehicles USA Incorporated et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A Perez
Represented By: Greg Horton
Represented By: Matthew E Tillman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Baez
Represented By: Greg Horton
Represented By: Matthew E Tillman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Vehicles USA Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew E Tillman
Represented By: Greg Horton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addy's Harbor Dodge LLC
Represented By: Joseph Gregory Studemeyer
Represented By: Kevin Mitchell Barth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]