Ice Box Company Inc, The v. Pilot Travel Centers LLC et al

Defendant: David Russell, Hercules Poly Inc, Barnes Paper Company, TNT Plastics Inc and Pilot Travel Centers LLC
Plaintiff: Ice Box Company Inc, The
Case Number: 4:2012cv00288
Filed: January 30, 2012
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1127
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pilot's Motion to Compel, ECF No. 49 , Hercules' Motion to Compel, ECF No. 52 , and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, ECF No. 65 are each GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth in detail in the O rder. The Order also includes specific deadlines: no later than December 7, 2012, Hercules is to provide a reworded RFP 15 to Plaintiff, which Plaintiff must answer by December 19, 2012; no later than December 14, 2012, Plaintiff is to provide Bates- number designations of responsive documents to Pilot and Hercules; no later than December 19, 2012, all parties are to serve supplemental responses as ordered within; and no later than December 28, 2012, Pilot and Hercules are to submit requests for costs and attorneys' fees as set forth within the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 12/5/2012.(mcot, )
January 24, 2013 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: By and with the consent of counsel for Plaintiff and for Defendants Pilot Travel Center, LLC and Hercules Poly, Inc., Defendant Pilot Travel Centers, LLC's Fee Petition filed December 28, 2012, ECF No. 117 , and D efendant Hercules Poly, Inc.'s Petition for Attorney Fees filed December 28, 2012, ECF No. 119 are each hereby withdrawn, with all issues regarding said Petitions being deem fully and completed resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/24/2013. (mcot, )
February 26, 2013 145 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED AND RESTATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER which supersedes Original Confidentiality Order, ECF No. 71 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/26/2013. (mcot, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ice Box Company Inc, The v. Pilot Travel Centers LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Russell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hercules Poly Inc
Represented By: Shawn Daughtridge Wallace
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes Paper Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TNT Plastics Inc
Represented By: Emily Ruth Gifford
Represented By: Francis Marion Mack
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Travel Centers LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ice Box Company Inc, The
Represented By: Henrietta U Golding
Represented By: Hunter S Freeman
Represented By: Danny V Butler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]