Howell v. Holland et al

Plaintiff: James Odell Howell, Jr
Defendant: Fred Holland and McLeod Regional Medical Center of the Pee Dee Inc
Case Number: 4:2013cv00295
Filed: February 1, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Florence Office
County: Florence
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 92 Report and Recommendation; Defendant McLeod's 55 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's failure to accommodate and retaliation claims under the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA), 42 U.S.C. § 12101, et seq. Plaintiff's 57 motion for summary judgment is DENIED as to Plaintiff's failure to accommodate and retaliation claims under the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA), 42 U.S.C. § 12101, et seq. P ursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3), the Court declines to exercise jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims against McLeod and Dr. Holland. Because this Court declines to exercise jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims, the Cour t does not make any findings with respect to the state law claims and declines to rule on either Defendant Holland's 56 motion for summary judgment or Plaintiff's 57 motion for summary judgment to the extent it pertains to Plaintiff 9;s state law claims against McLeod and Dr. Holland. The remaining state law claims in this case against McLeod and Dr. Holland are hereby REMANDED to the South Carolina Court of Common Pleas for the Twelfth Judicial Circuit in Florence County,where this case was originally filed. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 2/23/2015. (hcic, )
May 17, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Report and Recommendation 22 of the Magistrate Judge is adopted and incorporated by reference. Therefore, it is ORDERED that Defendant McLeods motion to dismiss (ECF No. 7 ) be GRANTED and that Plaintiffs eighth, ninth, tenth, and eleventh causes of action be DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 05/17/2013. (dsto, )
June 13, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 06/13/2013.(dsto, )
March 10, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 03/10/2014.(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. Holland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Odell Howell, Jr
Represented By: J Scott Kozacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Holland
Represented By: Andreas Neal Satterfield, Jr
Represented By: Sandi R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLeod Regional Medical Center of the Pee Dee Inc
Represented By: Collie William Lehn, Jr
Represented By: Charles Edgar McDonald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.