Alford v. Douglas et al

Appellee: Jerome Douglas and Michelle Hattie Douglas
Appellant: Loverrz Alford
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01141
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Florence Office
County: Florence
Presiding Judge: Mary G Lewis
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER: No later than August 8, 2013, Appellant is directed to do the following: 1. advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this appeal, explaining why Appellant's Brief was not timely filed; and 2. file Appellant's Brief with the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 7/22/2013. (mcot, )
September 19, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER: No later than October 7, 2013, Appellant is directed to do the following: 1. Advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this appeal, explaining why Appellant's Brief was not timely filed; and 2. file Appel lant's Brief with the court. Appellant is advised that if he fails to respond fully to this Order in a timely manner, the court's consideration of the above will result in the recommendation that this appeal be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 9/19/2013. (mcot, )
December 17, 2013 37 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 34 Report and Recommendation. The Court ACCEPTS the Report. Appellant's appeal is DISMISSED pursuant to Rule 8001(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and applicable case law on failure to prosecute grounds. Signed by Honorable Mary G Lewis on 12/17/2013. (prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Alford v. Douglas et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jerome Douglas
Represented By: Eric S Reed
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michelle Hattie Douglas
Represented By: Eric S Reed
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Loverrz Alford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]