Dawson v. Bush et al

Defendant: Larry Cartledge, Denis Bush and Florence Mauney
Plaintiff: William Douglas Dawson, Jr
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv02236
Filed: August 19, 2013
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Florence Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 52 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 04/28/2014.(dsto, )
May 6, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 73 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff is given fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order to file a Motion to Compel, pursuant to Rule 37 of the Federal Rules ofCivil Procedure to address any deficiencies he contends are present in Defendants' responses to his discovery requests dated March 3, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 05/06/2014.(dsto, )
July 9, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/09/2014.(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dawson v. Bush et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Cartledge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis Bush
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence Mauney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Douglas Dawson, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]