Whetstone v. Blue World Pools Inc

Defendant: Blue World Pools Inc
Plaintiff: Angela M Whetstone
 
Case Number: 5:2011cv01560
Filed: June 24, 2011
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Orangeburg
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
 
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion to Withdraw Reference, withdrawing the reference of adversary proceeding number 11-80012 and granting 2 Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Case. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 07/21/2011.(bshr, )
August 31, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiffs to inform the court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order if they intend to pursue arbitration or not. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 08/31/2012. (bshr, )
October 10, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel to provide the court with a status report on the progress of the case by 01/15/2013. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 10/10/2012. (bshr, )
January 31, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing the action without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 01/31/2013. (bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Whetstone v. Blue World Pools Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue World Pools Inc
Represented By: Michael McNulty Beal
Represented By: Paul D Harrill
Represented By: Randy Allen Skinner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M Whetstone
Represented By: Paul W Owen, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]