Monster Daddy LLC v. Monster Cable Products Inc

Plaintiff: Monster Daddy LLC
Defendant: Monster Cable Products Inc
 
Case Number: 6:2010cv01170
Filed: May 7, 2010
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 305 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 256 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 280 Motion for Reconsideration as set out. Signed by Honorable Mary G Lewis on 7/2/2013.(mbro)
September 30, 2013 377 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER finding as moot 345 Motion for Default Judgment; order as set out. Signed by Honorable Mary G Lewis on 9/30/13.(alew, )
December 6, 2013 401 Featured Case ORDER denying 389 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 389 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Honorable Mary G Lewis on 12/6/13.(alew, )
March 19, 2014 428 Featured Case ORDER and OPINION granting 267 Motion for Attorney Fees as set out. Signed by Honorable Mary G Lewis on 3/19/14.(alew, )
June 19, 2014 434 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 383 Motion for Attorney Fees as set out. Signed by Honorable Mary G Lewis on 6/19/14.(alew, )
September 29, 2010 54 Featured Case OPINION and ORDER denying 37 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/29/10.(sfla)
October 18, 2010 57 Featured Case ORDER re 40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Monster Daddy LLC, that the defendant shall file supplemental briefing within 10 days of this order as to whether Defendant's affirmative defenses are sufficiently pled, (Specific Document due by 10/28/2010). Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/18/10. (sfla)
November 23, 2010 68 Featured Case OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part as set out 40 Motion to Dismiss; denying 53 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part as set out 59 Motion to Dismiss. Monster Cable is granted leave to amend and correct within 10 days the deficient pleading of its fraud claim and affirmative defenses. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 11/23/10.(sfla)
February 7, 2011 85 Featured Case OPINION and ORDER DENYING Monster Daddy's 77 Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative strike, Monster Cable Products, Inc.s amended counterclaim and affirmative defenses pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and (f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 2/7/11.(sfla) Modified on 2/7/2011 to add "opinion" (sfla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Monster Daddy LLC v. Monster Cable Products Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monster Daddy LLC
Represented By: Matthew David McCord
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monster Cable Products Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]