Michelin North America Inc v. Inter-City Tire and Auto Center Inc

Plaintiff: Michelin North America Inc and Michelin Retread Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Inter-City Tire and Auto Center Inc and Inter-City Retread, Inc
Counter_claimant: Inter-City Tire and Auto Center Inc and Inter-City Retread, Inc
Counter_defendant: Inter-City Tire and Auto Center Inc and Inter-City Retread, Inc
Case Number: 6:2013cv01067
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion to Dismiss; denying 96 Motion to Dismiss as set out. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 11/6/13.(sfla)
November 6, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Motion for certification of an interlocutory appeal of the courts August 20, 2013 order denying a motion to transfer venue. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 11/6/13.(sfla)
January 6, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part as set out 122 Motion for an order to conduct mediation. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 1/6/14.(sfla, )
May 28, 2014 223 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER denying as moot 152 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part as set out 182 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part as set out 183 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 184 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part as set out 185 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 5/28/14.(sfla)
October 29, 2014 330 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying (329) Motion to Quash without prejudice in case 6:13-cv-01067-HMH; denying (249) Motion to Quash without prejudice in case 6:13-cv-02752-HMH. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/29/14.Associated Cases: 6:13-cv-01067-HMH, 6:13-cv-02752-HMH(sfla, ) Modified on 10/29/2014 to edit text(jtho, ).
December 4, 2014 381 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties must submit their response to 378 in case 6:13-cv-01067-HMH, (and 298 in case 6:13-cv-02752-HMH), MOTION to Compel Further Discovery Responses from Michelin; by Monday, December 8, 2014 by 12:00 p.m. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 12/4/14. Associated Cases: 6:13-cv-01067-HMH, 6:13-cv-02752-HMH, 6:14-cv-01254-HMH.(kmca)
December 4, 2014 382 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties must submit their response to 380 in case 6:13-cv-01067-HMH, ( 299 in case 6:13-cv-02752-HMH), MOTION to Compel Discovery Against Service Tire, by Monday, December 8, 2014 by 12:00 p.m. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 12/4/14. Associated Cases: 6:13-cv-01067-HMH, 6:13-cv-02752-HMH, 6:14-cv-01254-HMH.(kmca)
August 26, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER granting 56 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/26/13.(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michelin North America Inc v. Inter-City Tire and Auto Center Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelin North America Inc
Represented By: A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr
Represented By: Peter W Herzog, III
Represented By: Giles M Schanen, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelin Retread Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Peter W Herzog, III
Represented By: A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr
Represented By: Giles M Schanen, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter-City Tire and Auto Center Inc
Represented By: William Alexander Coates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter-City Retread, Inc
Represented By: William Alexander Coates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Inter-City Tire and Auto Center Inc
Represented By: William Alexander Coates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Inter-City Retread, Inc
Represented By: William Alexander Coates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Inter-City Tire and Auto Center Inc
Represented By: William Alexander Coates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Inter-City Retread, Inc
Represented By: William Alexander Coates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]