Brooks et al v. GAF Materials Corporation

Plaintiff: Jack Brooks and Ellen Brooks
Defendant: GAF Materials Corporation
 
Case Number: 8:2011cv00983
Filed: April 25, 2011
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Newberry
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
 
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2013 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 91 Motion for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of the Court's October 19 Order filed by GAF Materials Corporation as set out. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/6/2013.(mbro)
May 15, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying 101 Motion for Leave to File as set out. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/15/2013.(mbro, ) Modified on 5/15/2013 to edit text (mbro).
June 6, 2014 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying 158 GAF Materials Corporation's Motion to decertify the class represented by Plaintiffs Jack Brooks and Ellen Brooks Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/5/14.(jtho, )
July 28, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL as set out. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 7/28/11. (sfla)
July 9, 2014 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 198 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/9/2014.(mbro, )
July 11, 2014 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying 197 Motion to Exclude as set out. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/11/2014.(mbro, ) Modified on 7/11/2014 to edit document type (mbro, ).
July 11, 2014 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting 192 Motion to Exclude as set out. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/11/2014.(mbro, ) Modified on 7/11/2014 to edit document type (mbro, ).
May 31, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Summary Judgment and to Decertify the Class. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/31/12.(awil)
October 19, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 77 Plaintiffs Motion to Alter or Amend Order and Opinion Decertifying Class or, in the Alternative, Motion to Redefine the Class. The court certifies the class and defines it as:all persons or entities who own any South Carolina property with GAFTimberline shingles manufactured at GAFs Mobile, Alabama manufacturingfacility between 1999 and 2007 which have cracked, split, or torn. The class isnot intended to include any structure owned by the Defendant or any of itssubsidiaries or affiliates. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/19/12.(jtho, )
January 3, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying 80 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/3/2013.(mbro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brooks et al v. GAF Materials Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Brooks
Represented By: Daniel Alvah Speights
Represented By: Algernon Gibson Solomons, III
Represented By: Thomas H Pope, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Brooks
Represented By: Thomas H Pope, III
Represented By: Algernon Gibson Solomons, III
Represented By: Daniel Alvah Speights
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAF Materials Corporation
Represented By: Gray Thomas Culbreath
Represented By: Joel Allen Mintzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]