Sauer Danfoss US Company v. Luo et al

Defendant: Shanghai Guorui Hydraulic Technology Co Ltd, Ruiyong Ruan, Guorui Hydraulic, Jiangsu Guorui Hydraulic Machinery Co Ltd and Nianzhu Luo
Plaintiff: Sauer Danfoss US Company
Case Number: 8:2012cv03435
Filed: December 5, 2012
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: XUS, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Ross Anderson
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for Wednesday, 9/25/2013 09:30 AM in G Ross Anderson Jr Court House, 315 S McDuffie St, Anderson before Honorable G Ross Anderson Jr. Signed by Honorable G Ross Anderson, Jr on 9/17/13. (alew, ) Modified on 9/17/2013 to edit text (alew, ).
September 24, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Motion for Permanent Injunction as set out. Signed by Honorable G Ross Anderson, Jr on 9/24/2013.(mbro)
December 5, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Ex Parte Motion for TRO as set out. The Plaintiffs shall post a bond in the amount of $5000.00. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 12/5/12.(sfla, ) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/5/2012 with modified document provided by chambers) (sfla, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sauer Danfoss US Company v. Luo et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanghai Guorui Hydraulic Technology Co Ltd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruiyong Ruan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guorui Hydraulic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiangsu Guorui Hydraulic Machinery Co Ltd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nianzhu Luo
Represented By: William H Foster, III
Represented By: Neil C Jones
Represented By: Ashley B Summer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sauer Danfoss US Company
Represented By: Gus Suarez
Represented By: John Timothy Merrell
Represented By: Phillip Arthur Kilgore
Represented By: Lemuel Gray Geddie, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]