Harrison v. Cartledge et al

Respondent: Leroy Cartledge
Petitioner: Larry Harrison
Case Number: 8:2013cv00874
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: York
Referring Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Summary Judgment; affirming 34 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/6/2014.(eric, )
March 11, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court Order to Vacate 39 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order affirming Report and Recommendation, and 40 Summary Judgment. This matter is herewith reinstated for consideration of Petitioner's 42 objections. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/11/14. (kmca)
March 12, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Summary Judgment; affirming 34 Report and Recommendation. It is further ordered that the certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/12/2014.(eric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Cartledge et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leroy Cartledge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]