Wierzbicki et al v. The United States of America

Defendant: The United States of America
Plaintiff: Honora Wierzbicki
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv03021
Filed: October 3, 2011
 
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Central Division Office
County: Pennington
Presiding Judge: Roberto A. Lange
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 36 Defendant's Motion to Strike Exhibit 10; denying 12 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 04/29/2013. (LH)
August 27, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion in Limine. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 08/27/2013. (LH)
July 15, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 7/15/14. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wierzbicki et al v. The United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honora Wierzbicki
Represented By: Aaron D. Eiesland
Represented By: Gregory Alan Eiesland
Represented By: Aaron D. Eiesland
Represented By: Gregory Alan Eiesland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]